ND HB1195 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 22-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to indemnity agreements in motor carrier transportation contracts.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 22-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to indemnity agreements in motor carrier transportation contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Francis Wald [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-15 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-13 | Concurred | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 044 nays 003 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-22 | Received from House | |
2009-01-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1195.html |