ND HB1262 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 34-01-20 and 34-11.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to whistleblowers and public health and safety; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Whistleblowers and public health and safety; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Zachary Ista [D] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 78 |
2021-01-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |