ND HB1308 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Dever, Triplett A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 51-33-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to temporary lifting of a security freeze; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Dever, Triplett A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 51-33-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to temporary lifting of a security freeze; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-17 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-16 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-16 | Second reading passed, y 092 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-16 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-15 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Wanzek Klein Behm | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Hatlestad Kingsbury Griffin | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-01 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-01 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La | |
2009-02-04 | Received from House | |
2009-02-03 | Second reading passed, y 093 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-01-29 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1308.html |