ND HB1333 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-27.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restrictions on adult-oriented performances; to amend and reenact section 12.1-27.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state pre-emption of local laws regulating obscenity; and to provide a penalty.
Title
State pre-emption of local laws regulating obscenity; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24 |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 14 |
2023-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Sickler Larson Braunberger |
2023-04-05 | House | Conference committee appointed Karls VanWinkle Roers Jones |
2023-04-05 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:49 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:43 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:42 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 13 |
2023-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 1 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |