ND HB1338 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL to provide for a legislative council study of solid waste management, with an emphasis on the siting and zoning of landfills on a statewide or regional level while allowing adequate protection for political subdivisions and property owners.
Title
A BILL to provide for a legislative council study of solid waste management, with an emphasis on the siting and zoning of landfills on a statewide or regional level while allowing adequate protection for political subdivisions and property owners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-22 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-20 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-20 | Second reading, passed, yeas 083 nays 005 | |
2009-04-20 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-17 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed J. Lee Andrist Anderson | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Hatlestad Koppelman Kilichowski | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-17 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-16 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 09:20 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-17 | Received from House | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 001 | |
2009-02-11 | Request return from committee | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 08:15 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1338.html |