ND HB1461 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Hogue, Nodland A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 2 of section 16.1-07-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restrictions applicable to early voting precincts; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Hogue, Nodland A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 2 of section 16.1-07-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restrictions applicable to early voting precincts; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 077 nays 014 | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-10 | Received from House | |
2009-02-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 069 nays 024 | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 004 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1461.html |