ND SB2075 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state veterans' home for improvements associated with the new veterans' home and a geothermal heating system; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide for a report to the budget section; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state veterans' home for improvements associated with the new veterans' home and a geothermal heating system; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide for a report to the budget section; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-27 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-27 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 083 nays 009 | |
2009-04-27 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-24 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-24 | Second reading passed, y 044 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-24 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-22 | Appointed Grindberg to replace Bowman on conf comm | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Kreidt Nelson Metcalf | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Kilzer Bowman Mathern | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 068 nays 022 | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 018 n 006 | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Hearing 03:15 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 001 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2075.html |