ND SB2229 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to appointments to the Red River basin commission.
Title
Appointments to the Red River basin commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 31 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |