ND SB2239 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Boehning, Dosch, Glassheim A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property tax assessments for new construction; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Boehning, Dosch, Glassheim A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property tax assessments for new construction; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] | Sen. Tom Seymour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-17 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 085 nays 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 001 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2239.html |