ND SB2250 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-18.2-05 and 15.1-18.2-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the expansion of the teacher support program to include support for teachers in their second, third, and fourth years of teaching; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
The expansion of the teacher support program to include support for teachers in their second, third, and fourth years of teaching; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Sen. Michelle Axtman [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:25 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:20 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |