ND SB2270 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Bellew, Metcalf, Mueller A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 40-49-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bid requirements for park districts; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Bellew, Metcalf, Mueller A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 40-49-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bid requirements for park districts; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-20 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-20 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 088 nays 003 | |
2009-04-20 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-20 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-20 | Second reading passed, y 045 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-20 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-17 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Hatlestad Pietsch Zaiser | |
2009-04-08 | Conf comm appointed Cook Oehlke Horne | |
2009-04-08 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-06 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-06 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 088 nays 004 | |
2009-03-24 | Laid over 2 legislative days | |
2009-03-20 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-19 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-18 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Request return from committee | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2270.html |