ND SB2293 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Headland, Pollert A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 12.1-17-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the assault of state hospital employees; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Headland, Pollert A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 12.1-17-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the assault of state hospital employees; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-23 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-21 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-20 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Boehning DeKrey Zaiser | |
2009-04-13 | Conf comm appointed Nething Lyson Fiebiger | |
2009-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 085 nays 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-06 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 004 | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2293.html |