ND SB2324 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. L. Meier, Wolf, Boehning A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 16.1-01-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to qualifications of electors; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-09-11, sections 16.1-01-09, 16.1-01-09.1, 16.1-02-01, 16.1-02-02, and 16.1-02-05, subsection 2 of section 16.1-02-06, sections 16.1-02-07, 16.1-02-10, 16.1-02-13, 16.1-03-03, 16.1-03-19, 16.1-05-01, and 16.1-05-02, subsection 3 of section 16.1-05-04, sections 16.1-05-06, 16.1-09-02, 16.1-10-04.1, 16.1-11-06, 16.1-13-32, 16.1-15-15, 16.1-15-16, 16.1-15-34, 16.1-16-01, and 40-09-03, subsection 1 of section 40-21-02, sections 40-21-07 and 44-08-21, and subsection 2 of section 57-40.6-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to absentee ballot deadlines for schools, initiative petitions, recall petitions, central voter file, political party organization, appointment of election judges and poll clerks, voter affidavits, statement of interests, political advertising disclaimers, certificates of endorsement, candidate petitions, spoiled ballot retention, canvassing boards, recounts, and city elections; and to provide for a legislative council study.
Title
Introduced by Rep. L. Meier, Wolf, Boehning A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 16.1-01-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to qualifications of electors; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-09-11, sections 16.1-01-09, 16.1-01-09.1, 16.1-02-01, 16.1-02-02, and 16.1-02-05, subsection 2 of section 16.1-02-06, sections 16.1-02-07, 16.1-02-10, 16.1-02-13, 16.1-03-03, 16.1-03-19, 16.1-05-01, and 16.1-05-02, subsection 3 of section 16.1-05-04, sections 16.1-05-06, 16.1-09-02, 16.1-10-04.1, 16.1-11-06, 16.1-13-32, 16.1-15-15, 16.1-15-16, 16.1-15-34, 16.1-16-01, and 40-09-03, subsection 1 of section 40-21-02, sections 40-21-07 and 44-08-21, and subsection 2 of section 57-40.6-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to absentee ballot deadlines for schools, initiative petitions, recall petitions, central voter file, political party organization, appointment of election judges and poll clerks, voter affidavits, statement of interests, political advertising disclaimers, certificates of endorsement, candidate petitions, spoiled ballot retention, canvassing boards, recounts, and city elections; and to provide for a legislative council study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 003 | |
2009-04-17 | Concurred | |
2009-04-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 089 nays 002 | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 002 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2324.html |