ND SB2372 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Belter, Monson, Schneider A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-34.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the promotion of life science industries.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Belter, Monson, Schneider A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-34.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the promotion of life science industries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-13 | Concurred | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-19 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 011 n 001 | |
2009-03-13 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2372.html |