ND SB2379 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 23-02.1-01 and subsection 1 of section 23-02.1-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to homeless youth access to birth records; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Homeless youth access to birth records; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kent Weston [R] | Sen. Sean Cleary [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Concurred |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:50 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-03-09 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2023-03-09 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 04:18 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |