ND SB2389 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Froseth, Hunskor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-10-01, 15-16-01, and 15-17-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a name change for the school of forestry at Bottineau.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Froseth, Hunskor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-10-01, 15-16-01, and 15-17-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a name change for the school of forestry at Bottineau.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-23 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 078 nays 012 | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 001 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-09 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 040 nays 005 | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-04 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2389.html |