ND SB2406 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 014 nays 031
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 014 nays 031
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Berg, Pollert, Weisz A BILL for an Act relating to the comprehensive statewide tobacco prevention and control plan; and to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to qualified college savings plans for tobacco-free students.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Berg, Pollert, Weisz A BILL for an Act relating to the comprehensive statewide tobacco prevention and control plan; and to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to qualified college savings plans for tobacco-free students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-06 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 014 nays 031 | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 004 n 001 | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2406.html |