NE LB1020A | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Communication | |
2012-04-18 | Returned by Governor without approval on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-0-15 | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-04-03 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Select File | |
2012-04-02 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-29 | Placed on General File | |
2012-03-29 | Date of introduction |