NE LB1027A | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Clements FA448 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Clements FA448 adopted |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Clements FA448 filed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Clements MO1353 withdrawn |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Clements MO1353 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Date of introduction |