NE LB1032 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Transitional Health Insurance Program Act and provide duties for the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Adopt the Transitional Health Insurance Program Act and provide duties for the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | McCoy MO232 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO234 prevailed |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO234 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Campbell AM2528 withdrawn |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2473 pending |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Campbell AM2528 filed |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2473 filed |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2473 |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | McCoy AM2169 filed |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | McCoy AM2168 filed |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | McCoy AM2166 filed |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | McCoy AM2164 filed |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | McCoy AM2163 filed |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Health and Human Services priority bill |
2016-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Gloor name added |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28500 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1032.pdf |