NE LB1072 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a tax credit for sustainable aviation fuel
Title
Provide a tax credit for sustainable aviation fuel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | Sanders name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Brandt name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Dungan AM2110 filed |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2024 |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Ibach name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |