NE LB1098 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1074 amended into LB1098 by AM2594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1074 amended into LB1098 by AM2594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt and change provisions relating to water, irrigation, and natural resources
Title
Adopt and change provisions relating to water, irrigation, and natural resources
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1074 amended into LB1098 by AM2594 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB723 amended into LB1098 by AM2657 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB710 amended into LB1098 by AM2580 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB686 amended into LB1098 by AM2580 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB391 amended into LB1098 by AM2693 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Lathrop FA290 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Lathrop FA289 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Lathrop FA288 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST92 |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Wallman AM2876 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Wallman AM2876 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2857 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2857 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Christensen AM2657 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Mello AM2758 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Christensen AM2580 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Carlson AM2684 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Davis AM2693 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Carlson AM2600 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA279 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA278 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA277 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA276 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA275 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA274 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA273 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2753 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA284 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA283 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA282 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA281 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO186 failed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO186 Bracket until April 17, 2014. filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Carlson AM2783 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop FA280 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER235 adopted |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Carlson AM2783 filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER235 filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER235 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Christensen AM2657 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2594 adopted |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Mello AM2758 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Mello AM2758 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Mello AM2758 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Christensen AM2580 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Christensen AM2580 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Christensen AM2580 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Carlson AM2684 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Carlson AM2684 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Carlson AM2684 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Davis AM2693 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Davis AM2693 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Davis AM2693 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Carlson AM2600 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Carlson AM2600 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA279 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA279 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA278 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA278 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA277 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA277 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA276 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA276 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA275 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA275 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA274 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA274 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA273 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA273 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2753 refiled |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2753 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2753 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop FA272 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO174 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO174 pending |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO174 Bracket until April 17, 2014 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2594 pending |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Lathrop FA290 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Lathrop FA289 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Lathrop FA288 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Lathrop FA284 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Lathrop FA283 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Lathrop FA282 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Lathrop FA281 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Lathrop FA280 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Carlson AM2600 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA279 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA278 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA277 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA276 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA275 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA274 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA273 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA272 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2594 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2594 |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Carlson priority bill |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |