NE LB1098A | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2858 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2858 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Watermeier AM2845 adopted |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Watermeier AM2845 filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Watermeier AM2747 adopted |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Watermeier AM2747 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Date of introduction |