NE LB1142 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require and restrict certain actions of any animal control facility, animal rescue, animal shelter, or rabies control authority
Title
Require and restrict certain actions of any animal control facility, animal rescue, animal shelter, or rabies control authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |