NE LB1168 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1168 amended into LB920 by AM2388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1168 amended into LB920 by AM2388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the College Credit Testing Fee Reduction Program Act and the Career-Readiness and Dual-Credit Education Grant Program Act, add a fund to the Access College Early Scholarship Program Act, and change provisions relating to the State Lottery Operation Trust Fund
Title
Adopt the College Credit Testing Fee Reduction Program Act and the Career-Readiness and Dual-Credit Education Grant Program Act, add a fund to the Access College Early Scholarship Program Act, and change provisions relating to the State Lottery Operation Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1168 amended into LB920 by AM2388 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40773 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1168.pdf |