NE LB1178 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1178 amended into LB424 by AM2568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1178 amended into LB424 by AM2568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit land banks from entering into certain agreements to temporarily hold real property
Title
Prohibit land banks from entering into certain agreements to temporarily hold real property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1178 amended into LB424 by AM2568 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2539 filed |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2539 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40765 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1178.pdf |