NE LB1193 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change election provisions for certain bond issue, tax levy, and property tax limitation questions
Title
Change election provisions for certain bond issue, tax levy, and property tax limitation questions
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41375 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1193.pdf |