NE LB120 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for seizure of license plates of certain uninsured motor vehicles or trailers as prescribed
Title
Provide for seizure of license plates of certain uninsured motor vehicles or trailers as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |