NE LB128 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the Black-Tailed Prairie Dog Management Act
Title
Repeal the Black-Tailed Prairie Dog Management Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-04-02 | Legislature | Davis MO60 pending |
2015-04-02 | Legislature | Davis MO62 prevailed |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Davis MO62 Reconsider the vote taken to recommit to committee filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Davis FA38 filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Davis MO60 failed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Davis MO60 Recommit to Agriculture Committee filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Davis MO59 failed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Davis MO59 Bracket until June 5, 2015 filed |
2015-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2015-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2015-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |