NE LB1308 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate certain sales and use tax exemptions and impose sales and use taxes on certain services
Title
Eliminate certain sales and use tax exemptions and impose sales and use taxes on certain services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | von Gillern FA202 filed |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |