NE LB1346 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a property tax exemption for qualified affordable housing developments
Title
Provide a property tax exemption for qualified affordable housing developments
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Legislature - Linehan MO1189 prevailed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2024 |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024 |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan MO1189 prevailed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan MO1189 Suspend Rule 3, Section 14, to allow less than seven days' notice to schedule LB 1374 for hearing on February 14 filed |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |