NE LB191 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB212 by AM380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB212 by AM380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to budgets and public hearing notice for certain governmental entities
Title
Change provisions relating to budgets and public hearing notice for certain governmental entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB212 by AM380 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37304 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB191.pdf |