NE LB205 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to application of the Securities Act of Nebraska
Title
Change provisions relating to application of the Securities Act of Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 08, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Hadley explanation of vote |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 02, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2013-04-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER49 adopted |
2013-04-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER49 filed |
2013-04-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER49 |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM431 adopted |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM431 filed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM431 |
2013-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2013 |
2013-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |