NE LB376 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that public charitable corporations are subject to the Deferred Building Renewal Act
Title
Provide that public charitable corporations are subject to the Deferred Building Renewal Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2015 |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |