NE LB505 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB505 amended into LB254 by AM2901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide requirement for insurance coverage of autism spectrum disorders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide requirement for insurance coverage of autism spectrum disorders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB505 amended into LB254 by AM2901
2014-04-17LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2014-04-07LegislatureBrasch name added
2014-04-03LegislaturePirsch name added
2014-04-02LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM2094 filed
2014-04-02LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2094
2014-02-27LegislatureMello name added
2014-02-26LegislatureGarrett name added
2014-02-25LegislatureHaar name added
2014-02-25LegislatureWallman name added
2014-02-25LegislatureKrist name added
2014-02-25LegislatureKolowski name added
2014-02-25LegislatureHoward name added
2014-02-25LegislatureHadley name added
2014-02-25LegislatureAvery name added
2014-02-07LegislatureNordquist name added
2014-02-07LegislatureDubas name added
2014-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill.
2013-05-23LegislatureKarpisek name added
2013-05-14LegislatureSmith name added
2013-05-14LegislatureBolz name added
2013-05-13LegislatureConrad name added
2013-05-10LegislatureAshford name added
2013-05-07LegislatureMcGill name added
2013-03-13LegislatureJanssen name added
2013-03-12LegislatureCoash priority bill
2013-02-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 26, 2013
2013-01-24LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2013-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback