NE LB510 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor on March 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor on March 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change Open Meetings Act telephone conference call provisions and authorization for videoconferencing and teleconferencing
Title
Change Open Meetings Act telephone conference call provisions and authorization for videoconferencing and teleconferencing
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Scheer AM416 adopted |
2013-02-27 | Legislature | Scheer AM416 filed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-02-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |