NE LB634 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for issuance of permits under the Game Law to prisoners of war
Title
Provide for issuance of permits under the Game Law to prisoners of war
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM932 filed |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM932 |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 12, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |