NE LB653 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for interbasin transfers during times of flooding as prescribed
Title
Provide for interbasin transfers during times of flooding as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-03-30 | Christensen AM2617 filed | |
2012-03-30 | Christensen MO92 approved | |
2012-03-30 | Christensen MO92 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 12, 2012 filed | |
2012-02-21 | Christensen AM2028 filed | |
2012-02-14 | Natural Resources AM1844 filed | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on General File with AM1844 | |
2012-02-14 | Christensen priority bill | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-22 | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12516 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB653.pdf |