NE LB681 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB681 amended into LB851 by AM2561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB681 amended into LB851 by AM2561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to land banks and tax sales for delinquent property taxes
Title
Change provisions relating to land banks and tax sales for delinquent property taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB681 amended into LB851 by AM2561 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21355 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB681.pdf |