NE LB685 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Visitors Development Act relating to the use of funds and the members of committees
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Visitors Development Act relating to the use of funds and the members of committees
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Schilz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-16 | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Schilz AM31 filed | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12801 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB685.pdf |