NE LB698 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change load provisions and penalties for commercial motor vehicles and commercial trailers
Title
Change load provisions and penalties for commercial motor vehicles and commercial trailers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Bostelman AM1288 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM554 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Bostelman AM911 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Bostelman AM1288 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM554 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Bostelman AM911 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | M. Hansen explanation of vote |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2019 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Chambers FA60 withdrawn |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Chambers FA60 filed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Bostelman AM1288 adopted |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Bostelman AM1288 filed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Bostelman AM911 adopted |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM554 adopted |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | Bostelman AM911 filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Bostelman priority bill |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM554 filed |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM554 |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |