NE LB710 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB710 amended into LB1098 by AM2580
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB710 amended into LB1098 by AM2580
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide requirements for entering into certain ground water augmentation projects
Title
Provide requirements for entering into certain ground water augmentation projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB710 amended into LB1098 by AM2580 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2281 filed |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2281 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21478 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB710.pdf |