NE LB712 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB712 by AM2355
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB712 by AM2355
Summary
Change provisions relating to legal process
Title
Change provisions relating to legal process
Sponsors
Sen. Kent Rogert [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB712 by AM2355 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1046 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1045 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1026 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB990 amended into LB712 by AM2491 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB988 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB939 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB915 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB847 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB843 amended into LB712 by AM2472 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB840 amended into LB712 by AM2472 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB824 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB757 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB703 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB687 amended into LB712 by AM2288 | |
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 | |
2010-04-09 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading with ST9100 | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Lautenbaugh AM2472 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Lautenbaugh AM2472 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Wightman AM2489 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Wightman AM2489 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Wightman AM2482 withdrawn | |
2010-04-06 | Wightman AM2482 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Council AM2491 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Council AM2491 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Council AM2465 withdrawn | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8225 adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Council AM2465 filed | |
2010-03-31 | Enrollment and Review ER8225 filed | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on Select File with ER8225 | |
2010-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-29 | Karpisek AM2355 adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Judiciary AM2288 adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Karpisek AM2355 filed | |
2010-03-24 | Judiciary AM2288 filed | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on General File with AM2288 | |
2010-02-19 | Judiciary priority bill | |
2010-01-13 | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9567 |