NE LB724 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB724 amended into LB705 by AM1468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB724 amended into LB705 by AM1468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate certain basic skill and content test requirements for eligibility for teaching certificates
Title
Eliminate certain basic skill and content test requirements for eligibility for teaching certificates
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB724 amended into LB705 by AM1468 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-05-03 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Education AM1235 filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1235 |
2023-03-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |