NE LB741 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/portions of LB741 amended into LB742 by AM1934
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/portions of LB741 amended into LB742 by AM1934
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change application provisions relating to electric generation facilities
Title
Change application provisions relating to electric generation facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Schilz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/portions of LB741 amended into LB742 by AM1934 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-11 | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2012 | |
2012-01-06 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-01-04 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15709 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB741.pdf |