NE LB746 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB746 by AM2381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB746 by AM2381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Strengthening Families Act, change provisions for guardians ad litem and services for children, create the Normalcy Task Force, and eliminate a reporting requirement
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Strengthening Families Act, change provisions for guardians ad litem and services for children, create the Normalcy Task Force, and eliminate a reporting requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB746 by AM2381 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST63 |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Campbell AM2381 adopted |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER169 adopted |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Campbell AM2381 filed |
2016-02-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER169 filed |
2016-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER169 |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1903 adopted |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1903 filed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1903 |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2016 |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Campbell priority bill |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |