NE LB788 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB988 amended into LB788 by AM2930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB988 amended into LB788 by AM2930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to real estate loans, fiduciary accounts, decedents' estates, hearsay exceptions, mortgages, trust deeds, and safe deposit boxes
Title
Change provisions relating to real estate loans, fiduciary accounts, decedents' estates, hearsay exceptions, mortgages, trust deeds, and safe deposit boxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB988 amended into LB788 by AM2930 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB819 amended into LB788 by AM2932 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB815 amended into LB788 by AM2925 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB810 amended into LB788 by AM2924 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB775 amended into LB788 by AM2926 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB151 amended into LB788 by AM2929 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 22, 2014 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Larson explanation of vote |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 17, 2014 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST96 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2932 adopted |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2930 adopted |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2929 adopted |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2926 adopted |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2925 adopted |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2924 adopted |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2932 filed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2930 filed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2929 filed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2926 filed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2925 filed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2924 filed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2867 divided |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers AM2853 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Krist AM2435 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Krist AM2429 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER237 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2867 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2853 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER237 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER237 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Krist AM2435 filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Krist AM2429 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2739 withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2739 filed |
2014-02-18 | Legislature | Wightman priority bill |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2014 |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |