NE LB815 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change penalty and statute of limitations regarding concealing the death of another person
Title
Change penalty and statute of limitations regarding concealing the death of another person
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Fulton [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-10 | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2012 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15414 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB815.pdf |