NE LB820 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB820 amended into LB1055 by AM2573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB820 amended into LB1055 by AM2573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change required information on the voter registration application
Title
Change required information on the voter registration application
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB820 amended into LB1055 by AM2573 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2225 filed |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2225 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41027 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB820.pdf |