NE LB837 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB837 amended into LB1185 by AM2668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB837 amended into LB1185 by AM2668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to background checks under the Child Care Licensing Act and the Children's Residential Facilities and Placing Licensure Act
Title
Change provisions relating to background checks under the Child Care Licensing Act and the Children's Residential Facilities and Placing Licensure Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Arch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB837 amended into LB1185 by AM2668 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40904 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB837.pdf |